Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/13/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/26/2013