Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 02/14/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 02/14/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/14/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/27/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/11/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/11/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/11/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/07/2013