Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/12/2013