Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/08/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/28/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/09/2013