Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/14/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/30/2014