Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/18/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/24/2013