Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/28/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/28/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/28/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/28/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/27/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/28/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/08/2013