Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/14/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/27/2014