Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/04/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/21/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/25/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/26/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/14/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/17/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 06/12/2013