Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/18/2013