Refine your search

Refined by:

Kentucky Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2013