Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/17/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/03/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/12/2013