Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/27/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 04/17/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/15/2013