Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/30/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/03/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/03/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/15/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/22/2013