Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/30/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/30/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/08/2013