Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/25/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 08/02/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/10/2014