Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/26/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-69.
12/26/2013 Signed by President.
12/23/2013 Presented to President.
12/20/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/20/2013 Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9068-9069)
05/15/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 1 (Roll no. 147).(text: CR H2632)
05/14/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-55.
02/15/2013 Introduced in House