Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-34]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/05/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/13/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/13/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/25/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/25/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/25/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/20/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/22/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/24/2014