Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 03/25/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/09/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/09/2013