Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/09/2013