Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/20/2013