Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/13/2014