Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/14/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/26/2014