Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/11/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/20/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/20/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/22/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/23/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/24/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/26/2014