Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/25/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 02/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/26/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/27/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/28/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/05/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/14/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/18/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/25/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/10/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/12/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/18/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/24/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/24/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/30/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/06/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/08/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/21/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/24/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/24/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/19/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 06/19/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/23/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/10/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/12/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/16/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/23/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/05/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 12/11/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/11/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/18/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/25/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 03/18/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/08/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/29/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/29/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/18/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/25/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/16/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/11/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/12/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/12/2014