Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 02/15/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/12/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/10/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/09/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/15/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 06/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/14/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/08/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/31/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/09/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/29/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/29/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/28/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/28/2014