Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/25/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/05/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/27/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/06/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/23/2014