Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/15/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/15/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/05/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/09/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/04/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/05/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/10/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/10/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/28/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/09/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/09/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/18/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2014