Refine your search

Showing 14 of 14 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
07/22/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-128.
07/22/2014 Signed by President.
07/15/2014 Presented to President.
07/09/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 6 (Roll no. 378).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5887-5962)
06/25/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 3. Record Vote Number: 214.
06/25/2014 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
03/15/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 215 - 202 (Roll no. 75).
03/12/2013 Committee on Transportation discharged.
03/12/2013 Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
03/12/2013 Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
03/12/2013 Committee on Agriculture discharged.
03/12/2013 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
03/12/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 113-14, Part I.
02/25/2013 Introduced in House