Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/06/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/20/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/11/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2014