Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/10/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/11/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/31/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/25/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/25/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/07/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/17/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 08/01/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/01/2014