Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/08/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/18/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/02/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/10/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/14/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew