Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 02/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 02/25/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/10/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/30/2013