Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/25/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/10/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/17/2014