Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/04/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/11/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/25/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/13/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/26/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/28/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/06/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/06/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/06/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/06/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/12/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/26/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/17/2014