Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/28/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/05/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/01/2014