There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fair Wages for Workers with Disabilities Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To phase out special wage certificates under the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 under which individuals with disabilities may be employed at subminimum wage rates.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/26/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/23/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
02/26/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/26/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (97)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/26/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 03/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/06/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven [D-NV-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/25/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/25/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/22/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/13/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/13/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/28/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/29/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/28/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/11/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/29/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/10/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/10/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 06/19/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/19/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/24/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/24/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce02/26/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections04/23/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.831.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.831. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/26/2013)

Fair Wages for Workers with Disabilities Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of Labor to discontinue issuing to any new profit or non-profit or governmental entity special wage certificates (which permit individuals with disabilities, including individuals employed in agriculture, to be paid at lower than minimum wages).

Prescribes requirements for a three-year phase-out of all certificates.

Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to repeal authority and requirements for the issuance of such certificates three years after enactment of this Act. Requires revocation of any certificates remaining at that time.