Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/07/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/07/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/08/2013