Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/28/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/28/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/28/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/28/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/28/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/28/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/28/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 02/28/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/28/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 02/28/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/28/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/28/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/28/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 02/28/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/28/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/28/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/04/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/04/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/06/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/06/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/12/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/12/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/14/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 03/20/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/20/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/09/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/17/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/06/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/06/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/06/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/14/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/09/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2014