Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/07/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2013