Refine your search

Refined by:

Colorado Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/20/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2013