Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/05/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2013