Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/04/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/04/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/05/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/05/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 03/05/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/07/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/07/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/07/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/07/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/07/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/11/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/11/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/12/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/12/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/15/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 03/19/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/19/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 03/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/25/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 03/25/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/25/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/15/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/23/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/24/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/26/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/06/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/06/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/07/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/13/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/16/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/16/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/21/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/21/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/19/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/25/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 06/27/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/30/2013