Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/11/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/11/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/13/2013