Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/05/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/07/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 06/25/2013