Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/05/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/05/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/07/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/18/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/25/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/16/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/21/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/25/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/08/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/16/2013