Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/04/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/10/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/15/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/16/2013