Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/07/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/13/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/19/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/20/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 03/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/12/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 04/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 07/24/2013