Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/04/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/05/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/07/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/03/2013