Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 02/27/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/11/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/13/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/18/2013